CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. «12345...» Página 3 de 36 desde 01/07/1988 hasta 27/09/2024 28/02/2019 11:24 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Composition of the board of directors. - Composition of other management and supervisory bodies The Company communicates the resignation and appointment of Secretary non-member of the Board of Directors, Legal Counsellor and Secretary of the Commissions of the Board of Directors. Número de registro: 275418 28/02/2019 10:03 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Board of directors remuneration annual statement La Sociedad remite el Informe Anual sobre remuneraciones de los consejeros del Ejercicio 2018 Número de registro: 275408 28/02/2019 09:57 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Corporate governance annual report La sociedad remite el Informe Anual de Gobierno Corporativo del ejercicio 2018 Número de registro: 275407 28/02/2019 09:47 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Interim financial information La sociedad remite información sobre los resultados del segundo semestre de 2018 Número de registro: 275404 28/02/2019 09:27 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Information on P&L Corporate Presentation. Results 2018 Número de registro: 275394 28/02/2019 09:19 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Information on P&L Information on the results as of 31 December 2018. Número de registro: 275392 28/02/2019 09:11 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Information on P&L Presentation of results as of December 31, 2018. Número de registro: 275387 29/11/2018 15:52 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Information on dividends Cementos Molins, S.A. hereby announces that it will pay an interim dividend of Euro 0.13 per share next December 13, 2018. Número de registro: 272008 08/11/2018 10:33 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Information on P&L Presentation of results as of September 2018 Número de registro: 271318 08/11/2018 10:19 CEMENTOS MOLINS, S.A. Interim financial information La sociedad remite información sobre los resultados del tercer trimestre de 2018 Número de registro: 271317 Página 3 de 36 «12345...»