AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. «...31323334» Page 31 out of 34 from 01/07/1988 to 01/10/2016 The price-sensitive information presented in other languages is a literal translation of the price-sensitive information stated in Spanish 30/04/2002 16:26 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Announcements and resolutions of general shareholders meetings. - Composition of the board of directors La Sociedad remite acuerdos adoptados en la Junta General de Accionistas celebrada el día 30/04/02. Register number: 34925 09/04/2002 11:29 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Announcements and resolutions of general shareholders meetings La sociedad comunica que el Consejo de Administración ha acordado convocar Junta General Ordinaria a celebrar el día 30/04/02. Remite orden del día e informe del Consejo justificativo de la propuesta de modificación del art. 29 de los estatutos sociales. Register number: 34504 28/02/2002 13:45 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Composition of the board of directors La sociedad comunica la dimisión del consejero D. Eduardo Sanz Calabia. Register number: 33676 14/09/2001 13:43 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Composition of the board of directors La Sociedad comunica cambios en el Consejo de Administración. Register number: 31071 28/06/2001 08:24 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Announcements and resolutions of general shareholders meetings La sociedad remite los acuerdos adoptados por la Junta General de Accionistas celebrada el 26 de junio de 2001. Register number: 29902 07/06/2001 17:17 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Announcements and resolutions of general shareholders meetings. - Employees share and stock ownership schemes El Consejo de Administración de Informes y Proyectos convoca Junta General Ordinaria a celebrar el día 26/06/01 o el día 27/06/01. Register number: 29460 02/04/2001 17:52 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Composition of the board of directors El Consejo de Administración de INYPSA ha acordado aceptar la dimisión del Consejero D. David Naranjo Villalonga y designar Consejero por cooptación a Ambientes Urbanos, S.A., que ha designado representante permanente a D. David Naranjo Villalonga. Register number: 27781 23/02/2001 11:49 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Composition of the board of directors El Consejo de Administración de Inypsa ha acordado aceptar la dimisión del Consejero D. Juan Grau Almirall y designar Consejero por cooptación a D. Enrique de Aldama y Miñón. Register number: 26789 04/10/2000 17:48 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Composition of the board of directors El Consejo de Administración de la sociedad ha aceptado la dimisión del Presidente del Consejo. Asimismo ha acordado nombrar Consejeros Delegados. Register number: 25080 21/06/2000 18:10 AIRTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE STRUCTURES, S.A. Conversion into Euros Inypsa comunica que la Junta de Accionistas ha decidido redenominar el capital social a euros. Register number: 22976 Page 31 out of 34 «...31323334»