REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. «...678910...» Página 10 de 54 desde 01/07/1988 hasta 02/11/2017 28/10/2014 15:16 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Composition of the board of directors. - Composition of other management and supervisory bodies The Board of Directors of Red Eléctrica Corporación, S.A. has appointed the independent director Ms. María José García Beato as a member of the Corporate Responsibility and Governance Committee. Número de registro: 213238 22/10/2014 20:45 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Others on business performance and financial information Con fecha 22 de Octubre de 2014 Red Eléctrica ha tenido conocimiento que ha sido promulgado un Decreto Supremo en Bolivia relacionado con el proceso de nacionalización de la compañía Transportadora de Electricidad. Número de registro: 212780 13/10/2014 15:01 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Composition of the board of directors D Juan Iranzo Martín ha presentado en la mañana de hoy su dimisión como consejero independiente de Red Eléctrica Corporación, S.A., mediante carta dirigida al presidente de la compañía. Número de registro: 211856 07/10/2014 13:19 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Loans, credit lines and guarantees Red Eléctrica de España S.A.U arranged a 5-year credit line for 800 million euros, which has the possibility of being extended for two additional years. Número de registro: 211643 22/09/2014 13:57 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Credit ratings The rating agency Standard & Poor’s has issued a new report maintaining the company’s rating level and its outlook. Número de registro: 211014 30/07/2014 11:04 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Information on P&L First Half 2014 Results Presentation Número de registro: 209306 30/07/2014 08:03 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Interim financial information La sociedad remite información sobre los resultados del primer semestre de 2014 Número de registro: 209275 30/07/2014 07:49 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Information on P&L Red Eléctrica releases its 1H2014 results Número de registro: 209268 29/07/2014 17:54 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Composition of the board of directors The Board of Directors at its meeting held on 29 July 2014, has appointed Mr Santiago Lanzuela Marina as proprietary director of Red Eléctrica Corporación, S.A., as a result of the resignation of Mr José Angel Partearroyo Martín. Número de registro: 209254 24/06/2014 11:43 REDEIA CORPORACION, S.A. Credit ratings On 24th June 2014, the rating agency Standard & Poor’s raised its outlook on Red Eléctrica’s rating to Positive from Neutral Número de registro: 207525 Página 10 de 54 «...678910...»