BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED «1234» Página 2 de 4 desde 01/07/1988 hasta 27/09/2024 11/07/2019 07:32 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Composition of the board of directors Resignation of Mr. Paul Atherley as managing director and CEO and appointment of Mr. Robert Behets as acting managing director Número de registro: 280090 25/06/2019 11:35 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Others on business performance and financial information Initial drill programme Número de registro: 279534 14/06/2019 08:16 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Increases and decreases of share capital Communication on the issuance of 60,000 shares Número de registro: 279156 11/06/2019 09:20 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Others on business performance and financial information Update on the situation of the company Número de registro: 279016 28/05/2019 08:57 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Others on business performance and financial information Response to a price and volume query received from ASX. Número de registro: 278641 21/05/2019 09:41 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Others about corporate governance Publication of the corporate governance annual report (2018), on an individual basis Número de registro: 278444 21/05/2019 09:39 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Others about corporate governance Publication of the directors´remuneration annual report (2018), on an individual basis Número de registro: 278443 24/04/2019 10:27 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Information on P&L Quarterly report closed on March 31, 2019 Número de registro: 277333 08/04/2019 10:26 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Others on business performance and financial information Appointments on Nuclear Safety Council Número de registro: 276894 08/03/2019 12:54 BERKELEY ENERGIA LIMITED Information on P&L Biannual financial report closed on December 31, 2018. This RF replaces the one with register number 275811. Número de registro: 275816 Página 2 de 4 «1234»